Accounts and annual returns THE WILLIAMSON CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1077352
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 28 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2023 31 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2022 31 January 2024 360 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 05 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 21 May 2021 105 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required