GATESHEAD MUSLIM SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Educational work eg English for speakers of other languages (especially for women), mother tongue classes, homework club, community drop-ins, cultural and religious activities, cookery classes, yoga, dressmaking, school holiday activities, cricket and football for young people, healthy living activities, advice especially racial harassment and bullying; liaison with other organisations
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Gateshead
Governance
- 23 February 2000: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MOHAMMED ASLAM | Chair |
|
|
|||||
MEHAR AFROZ QURESHI | Trustee | 31 January 2021 |
|
|||||
AMBER ADRESS PAUL | Trustee | 01 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
SHABNAM KHALID | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ATIF MALIK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
TARIQ ASLAM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KHALIDA BILAL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MUJTABA GHAYAS QURESHI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MOHAMMED KHALIL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MOHAMMED BILAL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £86 | £3 | £9 | £2.36k | £2.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.65k | £4.51k | £3.22k | £3.33k | £3.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 13 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 02 February 2021 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27 NOVEMBER 1998 AS AMENDED 29 NOVEMBER 1999
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE ISLAMIC FAITH WITHIN THE AREA OF THE AREA OF THE METROPOLITAN BOROUGH OF GATESHEAD (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE AREA OF BENEFIT") TO PROMOTE ISLAMIC EDUCATION WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT TO PROMOTE EDUCATION IN RELATION TO MOTHER-TONGUE LANGUAGE AND MUSLIM CULTURAL HERITAGE WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT TO PROVIDE RELIEF FOR PEOPLE IN NEED WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITH RESPECT TO ISLAMIC BURIAL AND BEREAVEMENT TO CARRY OUT ANY FURTHER SUCH CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY
Area of benefit
GATESHEAD
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 - 4 WESTBOURNE AVENUE
GATESHEAD
TYNE AND WEAR
NE8 4NP
- Phone:
- 07989300031
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window