Financial history ROTARY CLUB OF YORK VIKINGS TRUST FUND

Charity number: 1078432
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £13.27k £7.76k £38.08k £18.17k £20.30k
Total expenditure £14.02k £16.53k £22.55k £21.29k £22.14k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A