JO'S TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Dedicated to women affected by pre-cancer and cervical cancer.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2010
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 28 June 1999: Standard registration
- 14 December 2010: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 14 December 2010: Funds transferred to 1133542 JO'S CERVICAL CANCER TRUST
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2006 | 31/07/2007 | 31/07/2008 | 31/07/2009 | 31/07/2010 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £141.76k | £159.79k | £149.81k | £210.24k | £231.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £138.57k | £144.60k | £175.69k | £170.37k | £514.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2010 | 13 December 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2010 | 13 December 2010 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2009 | 02 November 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2009 | 02 November 2009 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2008 | 20 May 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2008 | 20 May 2009 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2007 | 12 May 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2007 | 12 May 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2006 | 12 May 2008 | 347 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2006 | 24 May 2007 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 21 JUNE 1999.
Charitable objects
1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE UNDERSTANDING OF ALL ASPECTS OF CERVICAL CANCER. 2.TO PROMOTE THE STUDY OF CERVICAL CANCER BY SUPPORTING AND CARRYING OUT RESEARCH INTO THE CAUSES, PREVENTION, DIAGNOSIS AND METHOD OF TREATMENT OF THIS DISEASE AND BY PUBLISHING THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH AND 3. SUCH OTHER PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY AS SHALL BE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME SHALL DECIDE ("THE OBJECTS).
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window