LUTON CARNIVAL ARTS DEVELOPMENT TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Working locally, nationally and internationally we advocate for, develop and connect carnival artists at every stage of their development across all carnival art forms. We commission and deliver carnival arts of the highest standards of excellence enabling the UK public to experience the spectacle and magic of Carnival 365 days a year via our programming, digital channels and partner networks.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £241,462 from 2 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 25 January 2005: Standard registration
- LCADT (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR TONY ISLES | Chair |
|
||||||
Robert Djima | Trustee | 14 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Richard Nicholas York Owen | Trustee | 12 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Marc Nicholas Walker | Trustee | 07 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Louise Geraldine Allen | Trustee | 07 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ann Evelyn Binks | Trustee | 17 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD GORDON RENWICK | Trustee | 28 January 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £495.19k | £326.94k | £380.31k | £469.35k | £433.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £818.48k | £381.86k | £463.78k | £550.61k | £547.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £46.00k | £27.50k | N/A | £243.96k | £241.46k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 15 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 15 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 February 2023 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 05 February 2023 | 5 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 12 MARCH 1998, AS AMENDED ON 23 APRIL 1998 AND 11 OCTOBER 2004.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE, PROMOTE, ENCOURAGE AND DEVELOP PUBLIC EDUCATION, APPRECIATION OF AND PARTICIPATION IN CARNIVAL ARTS AND THE CRAFTS AND TRADITIONS WHICH SERVE CARNIVAL ARTS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED, IN PRACTICE NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
UKCCA
3 ST MARY'S ROAD
LUTON
BEDS
LU1 3JA
- Phone:
- 01582437100
- Email:
- info@carnivalarts.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window