Trustees DUNCTON HALL AND RECREATION GROUND
Charity number: 1076256
Up to date
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Helen Clifford | Trustee | 06 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Susan Avril Thomas | Trustee | 06 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Hilary Ann O'Sullivan | Trustee | 04 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Peter James Thomas | Trustee | 14 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Thomas William Cole | Trustee | 09 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
Alison Pindell | Trustee | 25 August 2015 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Beadsley | Trustee | 30 October 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.