BEAT THE COLD
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide advice, information and make referrals to help households achieve affordable warmth at home for health and comfort. Our freephone number is 0800 3892258. Specific projects assist households to install insulation, heating and security improvements.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Staffordshire
- Stoke-on-trent City
Governance
- 10 August 1999: Standard registration
- 09 February 2017: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 09 February 2017: Funds transferred to 1159027 BEAT THE COLD
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £194.25k | £189.20k | £193.89k | £180.70k | £235.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £202.97k | £184.65k | £190.99k | £186.40k | £198.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 16 November 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | 16 November 2015 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 02 January 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | 02 January 2015 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 23 January 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | 23 January 2014 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 02/03/1999 AS AMENDED ON 05/10/2010 AS AMENDED ON 06/10/2011
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN STOKE-ON-TRENT, STAFFORDSHIRE AND SURROUNDING AREAS BY THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE FURTHERANCE OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, DISTRESS AND SICKNESS, IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF AN INFORMATION, ADVICE AND REFERRAL SERVICE RELATED TO FUEL POVERTY AND COLD-RELATED HEALTH COMPLAINTS, AND TO THE EFFICIENT USE OF ENERGY (INCLUDING RENEWABLE SOURCES OF ENERGY).
Area of benefit
STOKE-ON-TRENT, STAFFORDSHIRE AND SURROUNDING AREAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window