HONICKNOWLE COMMNET LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The relief of persons resident in the City of Plymouth with a particular regard to Honicknowle & surrounding areas who are in condition of need, hardship & distress. The advancement of education (including) pre school of persons resident in Honicknowle & surrounding areas. Providing provision of facilities for recreation/leisure.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Plymouth City
Governance
- 17 September 1999: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANGELA CARTHY | Chair |
|
|
|||||
David Walton | Trustee | 01 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mark Parlett | Trustee | 29 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
ALISON TRACEY JAYNE RICHARDSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOSEPHINE BUSSELL | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £96.32k | £91.14k | £78.63k | £154.14k | £98.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £97.85k | £85.74k | £90.24k | £106.15k | £109.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £12.05k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 13 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 08 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 08 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 29 APRIL 1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 23 AUGUST 1999, 26 JUNE 2000 AND 8 APRIL 2006
Charitable objects
A) THE RELIEF OF PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE CITY OF PLYMOUTH WITH PARTICULAR REGARD TO HONICKNOWLE AND SURROUNDING AREAS WHO ARE IN CONDITION OF NEED, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS. B) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION (INCLUDING PRE-SCHOOL) OF PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE CITY OF PLYMOUTH WITH PARTICULAR REGARD TO HONICKNOWLE AND SURROUNDING AREAS. C) PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR THE INHABITANTS OF THE CITY OF PLYMOUTH WITH PARTICULAR REGARD TO HONICKNOWLE AND SURROUNDING AREAS IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. D) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE CITY OF PLYMOUTH WITH PARTICULAR REGARD TO HONICKNOWLE AND SURROUNDING AREAS.
Area of benefit
PERSONS RESIDENT IN HONICKNOWLE AND SURROUNDING AREAS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
64
Little Dock Lane
Honicknowle
Plymouth
Devon
PL5 2LZ
- Phone:
- 01752656336
- Email:
- lisalawrence@commnet.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window