Trustees LANDKEY MILLENNIUM GREEN TRUST

Charity Number: 1077132
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MICHAEL HARVEY GEE Chair
None on record
Pat Redwood Trustee 14 January 2025
None on record
Jann Wirtz Trustee 14 January 2025
None on record
Lee Consterdine Mr Trustee 23 July 2024
None on record
Jack Woolfenden Trustee 15 August 2023
None on record
Martin David Lusby Trustee 18 April 2023
None on record
Lynden Davies Trustee 22 June 2021
BARNSTAPLE MALE VOICE CHOIR
Received: On time