BOURNE ARTS AND COMMUNITY TRUST LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Wake House Arts and Community Trust, manages on behalf of the local Community Wake House which is a Grade 2 Listed building in the Centre of Bourne. Once the Home of the Couturier Charles Worth, Wake House is now home to over 40 Arts, Community and Educational Organisations which provide a range of Cultural,Educational & Support services for the population of Bourne and the surrounding villages.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 22 March 2000: Standard registration
- WAKE HOUSE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Martin Neil Siddle | Chair | 27 December 2013 |
|
|||||
David Leslie James | Trustee | 18 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ann Wakeford | Trustee | 13 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Martin David Adkins | Trustee | 19 March 2021 |
|
|||||
ALAN EDWIN MEAR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROGER BALDWIN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £88.48k | £49.91k | £64.44k | £66.65k | £62.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £66.74k | £46.34k | £55.98k | £90.36k | £78.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £25.00k | N/A | £9.69k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 11 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 11 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 06 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 11 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 04 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 04 January 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 05 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 05 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 23 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 23 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 21 APRIL 1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 10 NOVEMBER 1999 AND 15 MARCH 2000.
Charitable objects
1) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF BOURNE AND THE SURROUNDING VILLAGES WITHOUT DISCRIMINATION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION, RELIEVE POVERTY AND SICKNESS AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS 2) TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY AND ARTS CENTRE (HEREINAFTER CALLED WAKE HOUSE ARTS AND COMMUNITY CENTRE) AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME, WHETHER ALONE OR IN CO-OPERATION WITH ANY LOCAL AUTHORITY OR OTHER PERSON OR BODY IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
BOURNE AND THE SURROUNDING VILLAGES
Contact information
- Address:
-
WAKE HOUSE
41 NORTH STREET
BOURNE
LINCOLNSHIRE
PE10 9AE
- Phone:
- 01778 782224
- Email:
- enquiries@wakehouse.org.uk
- Website:
-
wakehouse.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window