WILTON DOG CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Dog training
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Redcar And Cleveland
Governance
- 31 October 2003: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Paul Bull | Chair | 10 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Glyn Eric West | Trustee | 07 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kirsty Jane Roach | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
CAROL GREATHEAD | Trustee | 10 November 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.11k | £13.40k | £9.13k | £17.47k | £25.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.17k | £4.49k | £7.57k | £19.57k | £13.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 30 December 2024 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 30 December 2024 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 02 January 2024 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 26 February 2023 | 60 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 27 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 28 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 22 JUNE 1999 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 20 OCTOBER 2003
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AND IN PARTICULAR DOG OWNERS IN RESPONSIBLE PET OWNERSHIP, OBEDIENCE TRAINING FOR DOGS AND THEIR RESPONSIBILITY AS DOG OWNERS FOR THE HEALTH AND SAFETY OF THE PUBLIC
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Wilton Dog Club
South Avenue
REDCAR
Cleveland
TS10 5LZ
- Phone:
- 07944 013755
- Email:
- WILTONDOGCLUB@HOTMAIL.COM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window