Financial history JOHN FOSTER CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity Number: 1078601
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £22.95k £16.62k £33.75k £41.53k £27.40k
Total expenditure £32.28k £36.51k £34.27k £40.21k £40.56k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A