Accounts and annual returns BOSTON WEST JOINT CHILDCARE COMPANY LTD

Charity number: 1081803
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2024 19 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2024 19 February 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2023 21 May 2024 82 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2023 21 May 2024 82 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2022 01 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2022 24 February 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2021 01 February 2023 338 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 24 February 2023 361 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2020 05 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 05 February 2021 On Time Download Open in new window