PAKISTAN WELFARE ASSOCIATION (SWINDON)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our main regular activities are: Advice Work, Admin, Educational Classes for the Pakistani/Asian community in Swindon. Liaising and working with local voluntary groups/ local authorities for mutual causes within wider community within Swindon & Wiltshire.. We also focus on development for culture and arts for all ages. Helping disadvantaged children and the disabled/elderly.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2012
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Swindon
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 18 February 2000: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ARIF QURESHI | Chair |
|
|
|||||
IMRAN KHAN | Trustee |
|
||||||
MOHAMMAD SALAS KHAN | Trustee |
|
||||||
AZIZUL HUSSAIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
AFTAB SHAH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.27k | £3.43k | £5.48k | £2.54k | £1.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.12k | £3.55k | £5.48k | £2.54k | £1.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 111 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 111 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 477 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 477 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 842 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 842 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1207 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1207 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1572 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1572 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 19 DECEMBER 1999
Charitable objects
1) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS AND PRIMARILY THE PAKISTANI AND OTHER MUSLIM INHABITANTS OF SWINDON AND SURROUNDING AREA WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR SEXUAL ORIENTATION (OR RACE) OR OF POLITICAL (OR RELIGION) OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN COMMON EFFORT TO: A) ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE SAID INHABITANTS; AND B) PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE OF THOSE INHABITANTS, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THOSE WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR AGE OR INFIRMITY WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITION OF LIFE, 2) TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE (HEREINAFTER CALLED 'THE CENTRE') AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME (WHETHER ALONE OR IN CO-OPERATION WITH ANY LOCAL OR OTHER PERSON OR BODY) IN FURTHERANCE OF THE OBJECT ABOVE, 3) TO PROVIDE EQUALITY AND OPPORTUNITY BETWEEN DIFFERENT RACIAL GROUPS
Area of benefit
SWINDON AND SURROUNDING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 ANGLER ROAD
SHAW
SWINDON
SN5 5SX
- Phone:
- 01793346313
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window