Accounts and annual returns HASBURY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1078427
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2019 02 October 2020 94 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 14 November 2019 137 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 11 June 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required