MARJORIE RICHARDSON'S
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide a meeting place for people over fifty or disabled. Low cost quality lunches, snacks and beverages in a welcoming environment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Surrey
Governance
- 08 March 2000: Standard registration
- 18 April 2023: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 18 April 2023: Funds transferred to 1198792 SILVER FRIENDS
No other names
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £27.44k | £6.16k | £9.91k | £1.10k | £3.76k | |
|
Total expenditure | £31.44k | £4.26k | £6.16k | £1.77k | £3.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £22.98k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 23 February 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 23 February 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 02 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 04 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 09 December 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26TH JANUARY 1999
Charitable objects
THE ASSOCIATION IS ESTABLISHED TO PROVIDE, OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF, FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, FOR THOSE PERSONS WHO HAVE NEE DOFF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, IN ORDER TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window