THE FRIENDS OF WOODCOTE PRIMARY SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
School fund raising committee
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Croydon
Governance
- 15 July 1999: Standard registration
- WISA (Working name)
- THE WOODCOTE INFANT SCHOOL ASSOCIATION ( W I S A ) (Previous name)
- WOODCOTE ASSOCIATION FOR STAFF AND PARENTS ( WASP) (Previous name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Helen constantinou-mantilas | Chair | 16 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elana Turner | Trustee | 06 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
LUC JOHN ANDREW HARDY | Trustee | 16 May 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.51k | £17.37k | £52.45k | £48.18k | £49.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £51.69k | £4.69k | £29.32k | £38.98k | £56.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 24 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 24 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 23 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 23 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 23 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 23 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 03 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 23 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AS AMENDED ON 19/10/1994 AS AMENDED ON 05/11/2008 AS AMENDED ON 27/03/2012
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF THE SCHOOL BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Woodcote Primary School
Dunsfold Rise
COULSDON
Surrey
CR5 2ED
- Phone:
- 02086609972
- Email:
- admin@woodcoteptfa.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window