HURSTPIERPOINT COLLEGE LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Independent Day and Boarding School for children aged from 4 to 18
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
Total income:
£36,461,000
Donations and legacies | £137.00k | |
Charitable activities | £35.26m | |
Other trading activities | £472.00k | |
Investments | £477.00k | |
Other | £114.00k |
Total expenditure:
£34,017,000
Raising funds | £1.92m | |
Charitable activities | £32.10m | |
Other | £0 |
£318,000 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £1.92m | |
Charitable expenditure | £32.10m | |
Retained for future use | £2.44m |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £1.92m | |
Charitable expenditure | £32.10m | |
Retained for future use | £2.76m |
People

439 Employee(s)
14 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 19 |
£70k to £80k | 5 |
£80k to £90k | 8 |
£90k to £100k | 1 |
£100k to £110k | 2 |
£110k to £120k | 1 |
£130k to £140k | 1 |
£140k to £150k | 1 |
£150k to £200k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- West Sussex
Governance
- 12 March 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ben Searls | Trustee | 19 September 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Camilla Mair | Trustee | 19 September 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Michael Lawless | Trustee | 19 September 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr Helen Graham | Trustee | 14 March 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Rupert James William Corney | Trustee | 28 March 2023 |
|
|||||||||
Maxine Janet Shaw | Trustee | 27 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
PHILIPPA JANE HOYLE | Trustee | 18 June 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr Ian Stuart Francis | Trustee | 03 March 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
Rev William Kemp | Trustee | 25 February 2019 |
|
|||||||||
Lesley Jane Corbett | Trustee | 06 October 2016 |
|
|
||||||||
KAREN MARGARET MACK ACA | Trustee | 01 October 2015 |
|
|
||||||||
MRS FRAN HAMPTON | Trustee | 02 May 2014 |
|
|
||||||||
KEVIN STEPHEN POWELL | Trustee | 21 December 2011 |
|
|
||||||||
ROBERT JOHN EBDON | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.14m | £26.45m | £29.81m | £34.04m | £36.46m | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.65m | £25.61m | £27.22m | £30.06m | £34.02m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £29.36k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £328.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £183.00k | £191.00k | £186.00k | £144.00k | £137.00k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £42.00k | £42.00k | £108.00k | £601.00k | £472.00k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £23.04m | £25.82m | £29.47m | £32.97m | £35.26m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £90.00k | £150.00k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £40.00k | £0 | £8.00k | £70.00k | £477.00k | |
|
Income - Other | £835.00k | £393.00k | £31.00k | £250.00k | £114.00k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £101.00k | £36.00k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £20.73m | £24.83m | £26.18m | £28.73m | £32.10m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £920.00k | £784.00k | £1.05m | £1.33m | £1.92m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £58.00k | £82.00k | £86.00k | £169.00k | £123.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £43.65m | £46.38m | £49.16m | £57.33m | £60.88m | |
|
Long-term investments | £1.58m | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £4.30m | £5.05m | £6.31m | £7.73m | £35.27m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£149.00k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £13.52m | £14.34m | £15.91m | £21.51m | £49.83m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 29 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 29 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 09 July 2024 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 09 July 2024 | 9 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 16 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 16 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 15 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 15 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 07 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 07 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 28 MAR 1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 06 JUL 2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 25 JAN 2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20 MAR 2013 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 12 APR 2013
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE TO PROMOTE AND EXTEND EDUCATION (INCLUDING SPIRITUAL, MORAL, SOCIAL, CULTURAL AND PHYSICAL EDUCATION) IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINES AND PRINCIPLES OF THE CHURCH IN THE DIOCESE OF CHICHESTER OR ELSEWHERE THROUGH ANY OR ALL OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: 1.BY CARRYING ON THE SCHOOL KNOWN AS HURSTPIERPOINT COLLEGE AND ANY SCHOOL OR SCHOOLS ASSOCIATED WITH IT IN A MANNER WHICH DEVELOPS AND SUSTAINS A CHRISTIAN ENVIRONMENT CENTRED ON THEANGLICAN TRADITION OF THE EUCHARIST AND AT WHICH A FUNDAMENTAL IMPORTANCE IS ATTACHED TO THE TEACHING OF THOSE PRINCIPLES; 2.PROMOTING AND SUPPORTING THE EFFICIENCY AND EFFECTIVENESS OF WOODARD CORPORATION; 3.PROMOTING THE USE OF THE FACILITIES OF ANY SCHOOL BY THE WIDER COMMUNITY AND (SAVE FOR PURPOSES INCIDENTAL AND ANCILLARY TO THOSE OBJECTS), NO OTHER PURPOSES.
Linked charities
- 12 March 2007 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
HURSTPIERPOINT COLLEGE
COLLEGE LANE
HURSTPIERPOINT
HASSOCKS
BN6 9JS
- Phone:
- 01273833636
- Email:
- info@hppc.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window