GUILDFORD ACTION FOR COMMUNITY CARE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Guildford Action supports homeless Individuals as well as isolated families. Our mission is to ?Enhance the lives of all those we come into contact with?. The projects are The Guildford Action Day Service (homelessness) and The GAF (Guildford Action for Families) support service. We aim to meet basic needs, maximise potential through group work, individual casework, signposting and outreach.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £45,217 from 2 government contract(s) and £226,918 from 5 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Surrey
Governance
- 22 December 1999: Standard registration
- GUILDFORD ACTION (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stuart Crouch | Trustee | 05 January 2022 |
|
|||||
Martin James Froggatt | Trustee | 03 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Creese | Trustee | 11 December 2019 |
|
|||||
Matthew Johnson | Trustee | 25 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
Emma Robinson | Trustee | 27 November 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £304.61k | £480.16k | £319.95k | £370.27k | £392.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £312.11k | £272.44k | £300.40k | £325.74k | £418.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £120.00k | £45.22k | |
|
Income from government grants | £120.00k | £154.60k | £149.23k | £103.83k | £226.92k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 March 2022 | 45 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 17 March 2022 | 45 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 16 February 2021 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 16 February 2021 | 16 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 10TH MAY 1999, AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 7TH NOVEMBER 1999
Charitable objects
FOR THE RELIEF OF PEOPLE ON LOW INCOME IN THE GUILDFORD AREA, WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS, BY THE PROVISION OF SERVICES FOR SUCH PEOPLE.
Area of benefit
GUILDFORD AREA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Beverley Hall Community Centre
71 Haydon Place
GUILDFORD
Surrey
GU1 4ND
- Phone:
- 01483 560003
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window