Accounts and annual returns WOODLANDS PRE-SCHOOL (PURFLEET-ON- THAMES)

Charity number: 1076715
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2012 10 January 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 05 July 2012 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2011 11 January 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 12 December 2011 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2010 27 January 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 27 January 2011 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2009 28 January 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 29 January 2010 On Time