ITESO WELFARE ASSOCIATION ( IWA )
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Iteso Welfare Association is in the business of nurturing development awareness, empowering and developing disadvantaged/vulnerable communities in the UK and Africa. These responsive activities aim to achieve positive citizenship, life learning, a healthy community and encourage community participation. IWA also provides translation and project evaluation services.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Kenya
- Uganda
Governance
- 19 November 1999: Standard registration
- 22 January 2019: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 22 January 2019: Funds transferred to 1170126 ITESO WELFARE ASSOCIATION ( IWA )
- IWA (UK) (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £110 | £207 | £207 | £7.62k | £30.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £692 | £605 | £605 | £6.42k | £30.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 14 January 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | 14 January 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 24 August 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 20 January 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 13 JUNE 1998 AND AMENDED ON 13 NOVEMBER 1999
Charitable objects
(1) TO RELIEVE POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISEASE (2) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TRAINING IN THE HISTORY, CULTURE, ART AND LANGUAGE OF THE ITESO PEOPLE AND IN OTHER SUBJECTS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window