Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF BETHLEHEM UNIVERSITY

Charity Number: 1077818
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2017 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2016 25 October 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2015 19 November 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 19 November 2015 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2014 21 October 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 21 October 2014 On Time