Financial history FRIENDS OF BETHLEHEM UNIVERSITY

Charity number: 1077818
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2012 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016
Total gross income £42.64k £65.10k £42.12k £29.11k £21.71k
Total expenditure £92.31k £69.44k £364.44k £117.28k £33.55k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £0 £0