Financial history THE TROY TRUST

Charity number: 1078803
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £726.04k £792.91k £703.93k £793.64k £264.39k
Total expenditure £670.85k £826.69k £669.50k £495.27k £813.57k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £101.57k £117.79k £110.09k £92.98k £32.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £724.45k £791.83k £354.12k £601.89k N/A
Income - Other trading activities £1.18k £943 £1.29k £21.50k N/A
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £348.43k £165.83k N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Investment £413 £140 £90 £4.24k N/A
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £180 N/A
Income - Legacies £75.00k £17.89k £316 £25.90k N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £640.85k £799.19k £324 £350 N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £30.00k £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £324 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 £27.50k £669.17k £494.92k N/A