BOULTON LANE PARK COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1110589
Charity reporting is up to date (3 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Local community centre. We provide meeting facilities for local groups, including pre-school, running club, drama, religious group, yoga.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £14,346
Total expenditure: £9,893

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Disability
  • Amateur Sport
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Derby City
  • Derbyshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 27 July 2005: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Craig Fletcher Trustee 06 August 2024
None on record
Dr Ian Crompton Trustee 06 March 2023
None on record
DEBORAH WEETMAN Trustee
None on record
LORRAINE MAIDENS Trustee
None on record
PAUL RANDLE Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £4.76k £403 £5.00k £7.01k £14.35k
Total expenditure £4.92k £5.59k £5.92k £5.86k £9.89k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 03 February 2025 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 03 February 2025 369 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 27 March 2023 55 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 27 March 2023 420 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 27 March 2023 785 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
37 Watermeadow Rd
ALVASTON
Derby
Derby
Derbyshire
DE24 0TE
Phone:
07703721937
Website:

No information available