Financial history PARITY

Charity Number: 1107795
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £1.64k £1.25k £5.79k £3.90k £1.30k
Total expenditure £2.64k £1.56k £2.04k £3.06k £2.26k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A