PARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Identification of statutory and non-statutory inequalities in the treatment of men and women Legal advice to members encountering sex inequalities Studies on lack of effective support services for male victims of domestic violence Concern at persisting academic under-achievement of boys compared to girls
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 25 January 2005: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rex Bourne | Chair | 21 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Butterly | Trustee | 03 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH HOBSON | Trustee | 26 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
DAVID HYATT | Trustee | 08 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Chandrakant Vaghela | Trustee | 16 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
JOHN BOYCE MAYS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.64k | £1.25k | £5.79k | £3.90k | £1.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.64k | £1.56k | £2.04k | £3.06k | £2.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 07 November 2022 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 01 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION DATED 26TH JANUARY 1999
Charitable objects
(A) THE ASSOCIATION IS ESTABLISHED- (1) TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE EQUAL RIGHTS OF MEN AND WOMEN TO THE ENJOYMENT OF ALL CIVIL, POLITICAL, ECONOMIC, SOCIAL AND CULTURAL RIGHTS UNDER THE LAW. (2) TO INSTITUTE PROCEEDINGS IN THE UK OR APPROPRIATE EUROPEAN COURTS FOR THE PURPOSE OF ESTABLISHING OR PROTECTING ANY SUCH EQUAL RIGHTS AS AFORESAID.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
39 Cotton Road
POTTERS BAR
Hertfordshire
EN6 5JT
- Phone:
- 07966742512
- Email:
- secretary@parity-uk.org
- Website:
-
parity.charity
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window