THE WEST COUNTRY HISTORIC OMNIBUS AND TRANSPORT TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the education of the public in the history of transport in the West Country and in particular the history of omnibuses, coaches and commercial vehicles of West Country origin
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
18 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 10 March 2000: Standard registration
- WHOTT (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROBERT JAMES CRAWLEY | Chair | 13 November 1999 |
|
|
||||
Ralph Ellis | Trustee | 17 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Antony Grove Hazell | Trustee | 17 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Murray Roberts | Trustee | 17 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Geoffrey Peter Chidzey | Trustee | 09 May 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.59k | £24.33k | £12.71k | £50.05k | £20.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.31k | £18.44k | £18.19k | £22.60k | £25.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 11 December 2024 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 02 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 19 July 2024 | 232 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 19 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 08 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 16 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 26 MAY 1999 AS AMENDED BY A SPECIAL RESOLUTION ON 8 JANUARY 2000.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE HISTORY OF TRANSPORT IN THE WEST COUNTRY AND IN PARTICULAR THE HISTORY OF OMNIBUSES, COACHES AND COMMERCIAL VEHICLES OF WEST COUNTRY ORIGIN.
Area of benefit
WEST COUNTRY
Contact information
- Address:
-
KALMIA
CHURCH ROAD
COLATON RALEIGH
SIDMOUTH
EX10 0LW
- Phone:
- 01395567795
- Email:
- chairman@busmuseum.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window