CHILDREN COME FIRST (DAVENTRY)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Child Contact Centre
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 08 November 1999: Standard registration
- 11 December 2024: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 11 December 2024: Funds transferred to 1078636 NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF CHILD CONTACT CENTRES
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.96k | £2.43k | £2.93k | £2.76k | £1.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.79k | £4.03k | £1.89k | £465 | £1.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 332 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 332 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 14 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 13 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 22 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 21 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10TH DECEMBER 1996 AS AMENDED 5TH OCTOBER 1999
Charitable objects
TO ALLEVIATE THE HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS OF CHILDREN RESIDENT IN THE DAVENTRY DISTRICT CAUSED BY FAMILY BREAKDOWN AND TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE MENTAL AND PHYSICAL HEALTH OF SUCH CHILDREN BY PROVIDING AND MAINTAINING A CENTRE AND FACILITIES WHEREBY SUCH CHILDREN CAN MORE READILY ENJOY THE COMPANY AND LOVE OF THEIR NON-RESIDENTIAL PARENT.
Area of benefit
DAVENTRY DISTRICT
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window