Financial history MIND IN KINGSTON

Charity number: 1076791
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £398.39k £458.52k £433.57k £579.97k £789.16k
Total expenditure £333.49k £346.89k £430.57k £634.55k £870.51k
Income from government contracts £190.69k £124.11k £217.20k £286.67k £434.83k
Income from government grants N/A £15.30k £22.67k £133.79k £63.29k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £54.34k £29.80k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £525.02k £758.58k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £614 £781
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £1.40k £333
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £629.66k £636.98k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £4.90k £3.17k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £5.20k £6.48k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 £230.36k