Trustees MIND IN KINGSTON
Charity number: 1076791

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kevin Mitchell | Chair | 28 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Ceri Potter | Trustee | 06 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Camilla Gemma Fadel | Trustee | 18 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sophie McCallum Adam | Trustee | 25 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Bijal Dattani | Trustee | 05 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rory Liam Kidger | Trustee | 09 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Gerard Noel Doyle | Trustee | 25 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
MARILYN FANE CORRY | Trustee | 20 February 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.