DORSET RECLAIM

Charity number: 1076996
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Dorset Reclaim operates across Dorset & western Hampshire as a furniture re-use project, collecting surplus electrical appliances, household items and furniture from local people and businesses. Our aims are to supply good quality items at low cost, provide a range of volunteering and training opportunities and to reduce the amount going to landfill by service provision and education.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Bournemouth
  • Dorset
  • Hampshire
  • Poole

Governance

Registration history:
  • 11 August 1999: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
RAY TOVEY Chair 09 November 2018
None on record
Stephen Game Trustee 20 March 2024
None on record
Tony Erwood Trustee 24 November 2014
None on record
MICHAEL HARTLAND Trustee
None on record
EDWARD TAYLOR Trustee
ESSENTIAL DRUG AND ALCOHOL SERVICES
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £800.34k £844.87k £757.34k £904.75k £922.07k
Total expenditure £715.09k £796.05k £840.19k £842.92k £915.47k
Income from government contracts £60.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £167.40k £127.77k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £204.74k £250 £126 £56.98k £4.62k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £595.48k £660.57k £750.85k £846.05k £914.37k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £124 £78 £374 £1.72k £3.08k
Income - Other £0 £183.97k £6.12k £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £714.63k £796.05k £840.19k £842.92k £915.47k
Expenditure - Raising funds £453 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £35.79k £35.60k £37.72k £35.27k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Own use assets £14.05k £4.84k £4.80k £33.56k £48.53k
Long-term investments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Other assets £328.19k £405.14k £320.35k £300.30k £287.97k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £50.96k £69.87k £69.97k £16.85k £16.91k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2024 12 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2024 12 March 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2023 02 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 02 July 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2022 17 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 17 May 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2021 24 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 24 May 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2020 11 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 11 May 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
83-95 STANLEY ROAD
BOURNEMOUTH
BH1 4SD
Phone:
01202773384