Friends of Stalham Schools

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
FUNDRAISING FOR THE SCHOOL TO PROVIDE EDUCATIONAL BENIFITS FOR THE CHILDREN. FOR EXAMPLE PROVIDING ADDITIONAL FUNDING FOR EDUCATIONAL EQUIPMENT, GAMES AND BOOKS, TRIPS, VISITS AND SPORTS ACTIVITIES ETC.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Norfolk
Governance
- 26 July 1999: Standard registration
- 21 June 2022: Funds received from 1038395 PARENTS, TEACHERS AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION, STALHAM...
- F O S M S (Previous name)
- FRIENDS OF STALHAM JUNIOR SCHOOL (Previous name)
- FRIENDS OF STALHAM MIDDLE SCHOOL (Previous name)
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SOPHIE POWLEY | Trustee | 01 October 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.48k | £5.46k | £15.53k | £7.83k | £7.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.78k | £5.39k | £11.31k | £9.58k | £9.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 24 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 26 January 2023 | 210 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 12 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 18 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON THE 7TH NOVEMBER 1996, AS AMENDED 4TH OCTOBER 2007 as amended on 12 Nov 2020
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL.
Area of benefit
STALHAM,NORFOLK
Contact information
- Address:
-
STALHAM ACADEMY
YARMOUTH ROAD
STALHAM
NORWICH
NR12 9PS
- Phone:
- 01692580053
- Email:
- jafas@stalhamacademy.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window