Financial history BARROW CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU

Charity number: 1077427
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £359.31k £459.69k £342.62k £397.30k £433.04k
Total expenditure £374.27k £400.63k £370.67k £391.56k £345.29k
Income from government contracts N/A £134.54k £31.91k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £273.91k £156.34k £158.50k £218.67k £254.13k