DEVIZES AND DISTRICT U3A

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The U3A is an inclusive, democratic, self-funded organisation that provides many types of educational, creative and leisure activities for retired and semi-retired people at minimal cost, making use of the knowledge and skills of its members.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

16 Trustee(s)
77 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 02 August 1999: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GEOFFREY CHARLES PALMER | Chair | 25 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Madeleine Roberta Lestrange | Trustee | 28 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Shirley Joan Gray | Trustee | 25 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE NORMA LOWETH | Trustee | 25 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Luckhurst | Trustee | 25 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Carol M Sainsbury | Trustee | 25 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christine Elizabeth Geddes | Trustee | 24 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Suzanne Green | Trustee | 27 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christine Green | Trustee | 27 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
JOHN ANGELL TOTTEN | Trustee | 03 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
JEAN MARGARET THOMSON | Trustee | 05 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
WILLIAM DAVID RALPH SPENS | Trustee | 04 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
JANET MARY RUTTER | Trustee | 14 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Martin Houghton | Trustee | 22 May 2018 |
|
|||||
PETER FRANKS | Trustee | 26 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
JOHN WELLER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £36.64k | £13.47k | £50.53k | £21.51k | £41.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £40.10k | £10.39k | £49.15k | £21.53k | £44.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 06 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 03 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 14 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12 APR 1996 AS AMENDED ON 17 MAY 2013 AS AMENDED ON 24 MAY 2016 as amended on 29 Dec 2020
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AND IN PARTICULAR THE EDUCATION OF MIDDLE-AGED AND OLDER PEOPLE WHO ARE NOT IN FULL TIME GAINFUL EMPLOYMENT WITHIN THE AREA OF DEVIZES AND IN THE SURROUNDING DISTRICT. 2) THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR LEISURE TIME AND RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE ABOVE PERSONS IN THE INTEREST OF THEIR SOCIAL WELFARE.
Area of benefit
DEVIZES AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
11 The Moorlands
DEVIZES
Wiltshire
SN10 5HF
- Phone:
- 01380723180
- Email:
- treasurer@devizesu3a.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window