THE VILLAGE HALL STILLINGTON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Serving the community with space for public meetings, indoor bowling, Boccia, Women's Institute, Gardening Club, Village Archive meetings, Parish Council, Theatre and Music events, Film Evenings. Fundraising to support and maintain the premises. Also hired out to individuals and groups.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 15 July 1999: Standard registration
- STILLINGTON VILLAGE HALL (Working name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sarah Anne Raper | Trustee | 23 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Philippa Anne Hope | Trustee | 30 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Jane | Trustee | 25 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Harrison | Trustee | 11 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
PETER GRAHAM COOMER | Trustee | 03 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
HAROLD PHILLIP TOMLINSON | Trustee | 15 December 2013 |
|
|||||
MR BERNIE SMITH | Trustee | 15 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
EVETH HARRISON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MICHAEL TURVEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARY CARRINGTON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.02k | £11.23k | £9.76k | £14.85k | £14.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.53k | £4.68k | £13.61k | £15.98k | £11.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.00k | £10.00k | N/A | £4.18k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 13 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
LEASE DATED 9 MARCH 1962 as amended on 15 May 2019
Charitable objects
A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF STILLINGTON AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS AND IN PARTICULAR USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS
Area of benefit
STILLINGTON AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
AVANDALE
THE GREEN
STILLINGTON
YORK
YO61 1JX
- Phone:
- 01347811443
- Email:
- haroldtomlinson@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
villagehallstillington.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window