Financial history DURHAM CATHEDRAL CHOIR ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1078233
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £27.22k £35.40k £18.30k £6.00k £7.98k
Total expenditure £14.38k £14.97k £26.99k £5.50k £9.16k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A