Trustees DURHAM CATHEDRAL CHOIR ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 1078233

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Martha Jane Stewart | Chair | 13 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Cameron Alvan Hicks | Trustee | 15 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Venetia Rachel Lucy Bridges | Trustee | 15 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Amaleena Damle | Trustee | 15 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Henry John Sheen | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Georgina Clare Wilczek | Trustee | 16 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Louise Ayres | Trustee | 16 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kieran Joseph McLaughlin | Trustee | 19 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev Michael Hans Joachim Hampel | Trustee | 17 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
JONATHAN YIN-SHUN HUGHES | Trustee | 15 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
DANIEL THOMAS VICTOR COOK | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jean Mary Woodward | Trustee | 08 May 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.