Financial history TIPTON AND COSELEY BUILDING SOCIETY CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1077952
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £10.23k £12.35k £15.38k £15.46k £15.89k
Total expenditure £8.45k £11.32k £9.78k £14.61k £24.66k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A