TIPTON AND COSELEY BUILDING SOCIETY CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We support charitable and community activities within the Black Country area of the West Midlands making grants to other charitable organisations for the principal purposes of raising educational standards, increasing health provision and supporting the hospice movement, or similar objects or purposes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Dudley
- Sandwell
- Wolverhampton
Governance
- 27 October 1999: Standard registration
- TIPTON AND COSLEY BUILDING SOCIETY CHARITABLE FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Erroll Charles Blackwood | Chair | 15 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
JONATHAN MARK COTTRELL | Trustee | 01 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Phillipe Robert Etheridge | Trustee | 15 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Amy Victoria Fellows | Trustee | 28 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Karen Head | Trustee | 13 August 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.23k | £12.35k | £15.38k | £15.46k | £15.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.45k | £11.32k | £9.78k | £14.61k | £24.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 27 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 19 June 2024 | 80 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 04 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 06 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 27 OCTOBER 1999
Charitable objects
GENERAL CHARITABLE PURPOSES
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Tipton & Coseley Bldg Soc
70 Owen Street
Tipton
DY4 8HG
- Phone:
- 0121 557 2551
- Email:
- karen.head@thetipton.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window