BARNSTAPLE FAIR CARNIVAL CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Raising funds in order to stage a day-long event culminating in a Carnival Parade and fireworks display which offers local charities the opportunity to collect money for their respective charities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Cornwall
- Devon
Governance
- 30 September 1999: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
IRENE HOCKIN | Trustee | 04 February 2015 |
|
|||||
MATTHEW BREND | Trustee | 04 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP MILTON | Trustee | 24 March 2011 |
|
|||||
JOSEPH ANTHONY MARTIN | Trustee | 24 March 2011 |
|
|
||||
WILLIAM CYRIL HOCKIN | Trustee | 24 March 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.09k | £1.75k | £1.92k | £4.72k | £40 | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.94k | £1.08k | £1.08k | £9.97k | £30 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 07 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 06 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 08 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 10 JUNE 1999 AS AMENDED ON 14 SEPTEMBER 1999 AS AMENDED ON 22 FEB 2017
Charitable objects
THE FURTHERANCE OF SUCH PURPOSES AS ARE CHARITABLE UNDER THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE IN ITS ABSOLUTE DISCRETION SHALL DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE THE COUNTY OF DEVON IN THE TOWN OF BARNSTABLE IN ALL PARISHES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Clanton
Roundswell
BARNSTAPLE
Devon
EX31 3NP
- Phone:
- 01271377005
- Email:
- ness2109@btinternet.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window