Financial history PHOENIX PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1080867
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £258.52k £241.53k £239.01k £207.44k £248.70k
Total expenditure £243.09k £240.65k £248.42k £252.34k £253.83k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £251.29k £159.12k N/A N/A £240.93k