Trustees STRETHAM CHARITY
Charity Number: 1076863
Up to date
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KIER PETHERICK | Chair | 03 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
Jayne Chapman | Trustee | 09 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Peter Lee | Trustee | 28 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ellen Leeke | Trustee | 12 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Laura Roberts | Trustee | 27 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jenny Markham | Trustee | 27 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Janet Elizabeth Parish | Trustee | 22 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
ANTHONY MURFITT | Trustee | 06 September 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.