NORMAN FOSTER FOUNDATION (UK)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of the Foundation is the advancement of education genarally and in particular by conducting and promoting the study of and research into all aspects of architecture especially contemporary architecture and by publishing the useful results of such research.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 19 November 1999: Standard registration
- Norman Foster Foundation (UK) (Working name)
- THE NORMAN FOSTER FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
The Hon Paola Elena Foster | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
The Hon Eduardo Norman Robert Foster | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD JOHN DILWORTH MVO | Trustee | 14 March 2022 |
|
|||||
Professor Farshid Moussavi OBE RA | Trustee | 19 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
DAVID JENKINS | Trustee | 07 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
Lord Foster of Thames Bank OM | Trustee |
|
||||||
LADY FOSTER OF THAMES BANK | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £82.00k | £40.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £34.70k | £29.76k | £28.45k | £21.93k | £40.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 09 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 09 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 15 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 15 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 27 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 01 June 2021 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 01 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 14 JULY 1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 11 DECEMBER 2009. as amended on 04 Jul 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE: (I) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION GENERALLY AND IN PARTICULAR BY CONDUCTING AND PROMOTING THE STUDY OF AND RESEARCH INTO ALL ASPECTS OF ARCHITECTURE ESPECIALLY MODERN ARCHITECTURE AND ALSO BY PUBLISHING THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH. (II) SUCH OTHER PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY AS SHALL BE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME SHALL DECIDE ("THE OBJECTS")
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Riverside
22 Hester Road
London
SW11 4AN
- Phone:
- 07775992514
- Email:
- rdilworth@mal-ex.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window