THE FRIENDS OF ST. GEORGE'S CHURCH , WROTHAM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To recruit members and hold fundraising events to enable grants to be given to maintain, repair, restore, improve, beautify and reconstruct for the benefit of the public, the fabric of St George's Church in Wrotham, Kent, its monuments, fixtures, fittings, furniture, stained glass, ornaments and other chattels and its churchyard.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Kent
Governance
- 05 October 1999: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MALCOLM WIFFEN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Jonathan George Pearce | Trustee | 17 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Winram | Trustee | 25 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
John Winram | Trustee | 25 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE ANNE HAYTER | Trustee | 12 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
BRYAN ROBERT PARTRIDGE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LINDA ROBERTA READ | Trustee |
|
||||||
BRENDA ANNE JACKSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DIANA CLARE KNOX | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.16k | £9.27k | £7.23k | £9.98k | £8.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.68k | £1.74k | £4.16k | £12.98k | £15.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 25 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 14 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON THE 23 MARCH 1999.
Charitable objects
TO MAINTAIN, REPAIR RESTORE, PRESERVE, IMPROVE, BEAUTIFY AND RECONSTRUCT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE FABRIC OF ST GEORGE'S CHURCH IN WROTHAM, ITS MONUMENTS, FIXTURES, FURNITURE, STAINED GLASS, ORNAMENTS AND OTHER CHATTELS AND ITS CHURCHYARD.
Area of benefit
WROTHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE MALTINGS
BOROUGH GREEN ROAD
WROTHAM
SEVENOAKS
TN15 7RA
- Phone:
- 01732885172
- Email:
- dianacamellia23@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window