BR. E. A. C. C. - BRAZILIAN EDUCATIONAL AND CULTURAL CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Brazilian Educational and Cultural Centre promotes and disseminates information about Brazil and the Portuguese language fostering understanding and appreciation for Brazilian culture, literature, music, art, and dance. Our organization serves Brazilians, friends of Brazil and mixed families as a resource for educational programs, social events and cross-cultural exchange.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Bournemouth
- Throughout London
Governance
- 27 July 2001: Standard registration
- BR. E. A. C. C. (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KATIA FONSECA | Chair | 01 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Geovanna Celani | Trustee | 30 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Araceles Di Luca | Trustee | 22 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Glayson Da Cunha | Trustee | 01 December 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £43.36k | £57.74k | £30.84k | £74.75k | £56.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £43.08k | £59.53k | £32.84k | £59.04k | £55.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 30 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 30 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 12 September 2022 | 74 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 12 September 2022 | 74 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 24 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 24 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 25 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 25 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27TH MARCH 1999, AS AMENDED 1ST JULY 2001 & 8TH DECEMBER 2001.
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN THE PORTUGUESE LANGUAGE AND THE HISTORY AND CULTURE OF BRAZIL.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 8
45 Augustus Road
LONDON
SW19 6LW
- Phone:
- 07988690214
- Email:
- info@breacc.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window