SHREE DARJI GNATI MANDAL (S.D.) LEICESTER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Navratri, Diwali, an annual Childrens Xmas party, social events for all our members, including religious and informative seminars.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
150 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 08 May 2000: Standard registration
- DARJI COMMUNITY CENTRE (Working name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
jitendra Tailor | Trustee | 13 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
KISHOR TAILOR | Trustee | 28 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
BABU RAGHA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £30.39k | £5.83k | £17.12k | £23.60k | £28.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.38k | £9.81k | £14.55k | £8.70k | £15.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 27 November 2024 | 27 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 27 November 2024 | 27 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 13 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 September 2023 | 330 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 March 2022 | 141 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 13 January 2021 | 74 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 26 September 2023 | 1060 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15 MARCH 1997 AS AMENDED 13 NOVEMBER 1999 AND 23 JANUARY 2000
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE CULTURAL, RELIGIOUS, SOCIAL, LINGUISTIC AND ECONOMIC WELFARE OF DARJI COMMUNITY IN UK, PREDOMINATELY IN LEICESTERSHIRE AND SURROUNDING AREAS
Area of benefit
LEICESTERSHIRE AND SURROUNDING AREAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Vicarage Lane
Belgrave
Leicester
LE4 5PD
- Phone:
- 07977586875
- Email:
- KISHORT@HOTMAIL.CO.UK
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window