Financial history HIJINX THEATRE

Charity number: 1078358
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.20m £823.79k £855.81k £903.16k £1.00m
Total expenditure £935.90k £594.11k £886.66k £1.33m £1.21m
Income from government contracts N/A £672 £4.07k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £25.00k N/A N/A £34.83k £120.40k
Income - Donations and legacies £12.64k £18.82k £44.85k £1.56k £2.53k
Income - Other trading activities £907 £312 £18 £2.86k £1.32k
Income - Charitable activities £1.19m £803.97k £810.84k £897.42k £997.07k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.11k £312 £112 £1.32k £4.04k
Income - Other £0 £370 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £934.76k £594.11k £886.66k £1.33m £1.21m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £4.50k £5.91k £8.34k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £1.13k £0 £0 £0 £0