Accounts and annual returns THE FRIENDS OF SOUTHRIDGE FIRST SCHOOL

Charity number: 1076795
Charity reporting is up to date (27 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 27 June 2024 27 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2022 11 July 2023 41 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2021 22 September 2022 114 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 16 March 2022 289 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 04 February 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required