THE FRIENDS OF SOUTHRIDGE FIRST SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO PROVIDE EDUCATIONAL AND OTHER FACILITIES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUPLS OF SOUTHRIDGE FIRST SCHOOL, WHITLEY BAY.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Gateshead
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
- North Tyneside
- South Tyneside
- Sunderland
Governance
- 29 July 1999: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Fiona Spitty | Trustee | 10 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Naomi Reid | Trustee | 02 December 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.67k | £15.66k | £2.90k | £15.68k | £16.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.64k | £5.55k | £1.77k | £11.13k | £25.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 27 June 2024 | 27 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 11 July 2023 | 41 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 22 September 2022 | 114 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 16 March 2022 | 289 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 04 February 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10 NOVEMBER 1998
Charitable objects
(1) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF ALL PUPILS ATTENDING SOUTHRIDGE FIRST SCHOOL BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES (2) TO DEVELOP AND EXTEND THE RELATIONSHIP BETWEEN THE STAFF, PARENTS PUPILS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
SOUTHRIDGE FIRST SCHOOL
CRANLEIGH PLACE
BEAUMONT PARK
WHITLEY BAY
NE25 9UD
- Phone:
- 07716411031
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window